Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2972554

EP2972554 - INTEGRATED ELEVATED APERTURE LAYER AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.10.2016  [2016/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pixtronix, Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / BROSNIHAN, Timothy J.
c/o Pixtronix Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / FIKE, Eugene
c/o Pixtronix Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / SHI, Jianru
c/o Pixtronix Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / NI CHLEIRIGH, Cait
c/o Pixtronix Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / ENGLISH, Stephen
c/o Pixtronix Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / HAGOOD, Nesbitt
c/o Pixtronix Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
07 / LEWIS, Stephen R.
c/o Pixtronix Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
08 / VILLARREAL, Javier
c/o Pixtronix Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14714834.003.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US19900
Priority number, dateUS20131384243615.03.2013         Original published format: US201313842436
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014149619
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2972554
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02B26/02, B81B3/00
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTE ERHÖHTE APERTURSCHICHT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2016/03]
English:INTEGRATED ELEVATED APERTURE LAYER AND DISPLAY APPARATUS[2016/03]
French:COUCHE D'OUVERTURE ÉLEVÉE INTÉGRÉE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2015National basic fee paid 
07.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
03.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/43]
03.05.2016Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
07.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2016/43]
07.06.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2009103164  (FIJOL JOHN J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-14 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056]; figure 2c * * paragraphs [0078] - [0088]; figure 5 * [Y] 4;
 [Y]US2010181652  (MILNE CHRIS [US] ET AL) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0005] , [0019] - [0023]; figure 1 *;
 [XAI]EP2523033  (JAPAN DISPLAY EAST INC [JP]) [X] 21,22,24-26 * paragraphs [0012] - [0021]; figure 4 * [A] 27-30 [I] 23;
 [A]US2009244678  (HAGOOD IV NESBITT W [US] ET AL) [A] 31-34 * paragraphs [0218] - [0219]; figure 18 *