Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2972703

EP2972703 - NEAR-FIELD OPTICAL SENSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SnapTrack, Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2017/02]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Qualcomm Mems Technologies, Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CUI, Xiquan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / SEZAN, Muhammed Ibrahim
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / GRUHLKE, Russell Wayne
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / ZHANG, Qiang
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]01 / CUI, Xiquan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / SEZAN, Muhammed Ibrahim
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / GRUHLKE, Russell Wayne
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / ZHANG, Qiang
1718 S. Jentilly Lane Apt. 213
Tempe, Arizona 85281 / US
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14714856.306.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US21048
Priority number, dateUS20131382900914.03.2013         Original published format: US201313829009
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014158946
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2972703
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/042
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHES NAHFELDERKENNUNGSSYSTEM[2016/03]
English:NEAR-FIELD OPTICAL SENSING SYSTEM[2016/03]
French:SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE EN CHAMP PROCHE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2015National basic fee paid 
07.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
20.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2010187422  (KOTHARI MANISH [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] *;
 [Y]JPH0243501  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 1-30 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2013003201  (QUALCOMM MEMS TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]; MARTIN RUSSEL ALLYN [US]) [Y] 16-20 * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0120] *