Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2967761

EP2967761 - DENTAL IMPLANT WITH IMPROVED PROSTHETIC INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer Dental Inc.
1900 Aston Avenue
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SANCHEZ, Ramiro
44872 Corte Antigua
Temecula, California 92592 / US
02 / BASSETT, Jeffrey
1637 Kings Way
Vista, California 92084 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date14714892.812.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US24046
Priority number, dateUS201361801137P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361801137 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014150713
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2967761
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:ZAHNIMPLANTAT MIT VERBESSERTER PROTHETISCHER SCHNITTSTELLE[2016/03]
English:DENTAL IMPLANT WITH IMPROVED PROSTHETIC INTERFACE[2016/03]
French:IMPLANT DENTAIRE AYANT UNE INTERFACE PROTHÉTIQUE AMÉLIORÉE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2015National basic fee paid 
13.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
16.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2007037123  (MANSUETO ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0063] - [0083]; figure - *;
 [XY]WO9714371  (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 4e, 5, 6a, 6b * [Y] 15-20;
 [X]US2012295223  (ROBB T TAIT [US], et al) [X] 8-14 * figures 13a-h *;
 [XI]EP1728486  (STRAUMANN HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1-7 * figures 3-6; claim - * [I] 8-20;
 [XY]US2012178048  (COTTRELL RICHARD D [US]) [X] 1-7 * figure - * [Y] 15-20