Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2982018

EP2982018 - POWER SUPPLY UNIT AND METHOD FOR PARALLEL CONNECTION OF A PLURALITY OF POWER SUPPLY UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÜRMANN, Klaus
Ernst-Reuter-Strasse 31
32791 Lage / DE
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14714993.401.04.2014
[2016/06]
WO2014EP56541
Priority number, dateDE201320101455U05.04.2013         Original published format: DE 202013101455 U
DE20131011380010.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013113800
[2016/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014161861
Date:09.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2982018
Date:10.02.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H02J1/10, H02J3/46, H02H7/10, H02M3/16
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
TitleGerman:STROMVERSORGUNGSEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUM PARALLELSCHALTEN MEHRERER STROMVERSORGUNGSEINHEITEN[2016/06]
English:POWER SUPPLY UNIT AND METHOD FOR PARALLEL CONNECTION OF A PLURALITY OF POWER SUPPLY UNITS[2016/06]
French:UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN COURANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE EN PARALLÈLE DE PLUSIEURS UNITÉS D'ALIMENTATION EN COURANT[2016/06]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2015National basic fee paid 
29.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
23.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE202011050987U  (ZIPPY TECH CORP [TW]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * [I] 2,5,6;
 [XI]US6157555  (HEMENA WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 40 * [I] 5,6;
 [A]EP2501010  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0023] *;
 [A]DE2855466  (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-7 * page 1 - page 7; figure .; claim . *