Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3114806

EP3114806 - NETWORK NODE, DEVICE AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING AN AUTHENTICATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2017/02]
Inventor(s)01 / TANONI, Gustavo
137 De Picardie
St-Lambert, Québec J4S 1J3 / CA
 [2017/02]
Representative(s)Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/02]
Application number, filing date14715672.306.03.2014
[2017/02]
WO2014IB59502
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015132632
Date:11.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3114806
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015
[2017/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W12/06
[2017/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/02]
TitleGerman:NETZWERKKNOTEN, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSMODULS[2017/02]
English:NETWORK NODE, DEVICE AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING AN AUTHENTICATION MODULE[2017/02]
French:NOEUD DE RÉSEAU, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉS DE FOURNITURE D'UN MODULE D'AUTHENTIFICATION[2017/02]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2016National basic fee paid 
05.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/02]
05.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.10.2019Fee for grant paid
30.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2013343538  (MIZIKOVSKY SEMYON [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-19,22-26,28-32,35-41 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0015] , [0016] , [0021] - [0080] * [I] 5-7,20,21,27,33,34;
 [X]US2012260090  (HAUCK JERROLD VON [US], et al) [X] 1,11,12,21,26,31,37,39-41 * abstract * * figures 2,3,4 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0051] , [0052] , [0063] - [0068] - [0073] - [0076] - [0080] , [0082] , [0083] , [0095] - [0100] * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US2011238972  (SEMPLE JAMES F [GB], et al) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013227646  (HAGGERTY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); LTE; 3G Security; Specification of the MILENAGE algorithm set: An example algorithm set for the 3GPP authentication and key generation functions f1, f1*, f2, f3, f4, f5 and f5*; Document 2: Algorithm specification (3GPP TS 35.206 version 11.0.0 Rele", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20121101), vol. 3GPP SA 3, no. V11.0.0, XP014093304 [AD] 7,27,34 * page 8 *
by applicantWO2012058429
 US2012108205
 US2013303122
 WO2009092115