Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2994053

EP2994053 - 3D ULTRASOUND IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / WAECHTER-STEHLE, Irina
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / WEESE, Juergen
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2016/11]
Application number, filing date14715698.820.03.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014IB60004
Priority number, dateUS201361807885P03.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361807885 P
[2016/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014162232
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2994053
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2994053
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/08, A61B8/14, G06T7/00, G01S15/89, A61B8/00, // A61B8/12
[2016/14]
Former International [2016/11]A61B8/08, A61B8/14, G06T7/00, G01S15/89, A61B8/00, A61B8/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:3D-ULTRASCHALLBILDSYSTEM[2016/11]
English:3D ULTRASOUND IMAGING SYSTEM[2016/11]
French:SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE PAR ULTRASONS EN 3D[2016/11]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2015National basic fee paid 
04.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/11]
04.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
17.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2016/11]
25.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2016Fee for grant paid
18.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2016
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
20.01.2016Request for further processing filed
20.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.02.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
20.01.2016Request for further processing filed
20.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.02.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
20.01.2016Request for further processing filed
20.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.02.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.03.2014
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
MT20.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU20.03.2014
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
MT20.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU20.03.2014
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
MT20.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/47]AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
MT20.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
MT20.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU20.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[YD]US2011201935  (COLLET-BILLON ANTOINE [FR], et al) [YD] 1,2,4-9,11,12,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2012065510  (SNARE STEN ROAR [NO], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1,2,6 *;
 [A]US2012232394  (TOJI BUNPEI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0102] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US2010195881  (ORDERUD FREDRIK [NO], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1470784  (ALOKA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1,2,6 *
by applicantUS2011201935
    - ECABERT, O. ET AL., "Automatic Model-based Segmentation of the Heart in CT Images", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, (2008), vol. 27, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1109/TMI.2008.918330, pages 1189 - 1291, XP011226714

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2008.918330