blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2997332

EP2997332 - NAVIGATION AID FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH AUTOPILOT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[2016/12]
Inventor(s)01 / GIESLER, Björn
Ziegeleistrasse 30b
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
02 / REICHEL, Michael
Zuccallostr. 12
85049 Ingolstadt / DE
03 / KLAAS, Sebastian
Wettstettener Strasse 41
85101 Lenting / DE
 [2016/12]
Representative(s)Bauer, Dominik Michael
Audi AG
Patentabteilung
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[2016/12]
Application number, filing date14715849.705.04.2014
[2016/12]
WO2014EP00918
Priority number, dateDE2013100860516.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013008605
[2016/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014183822
Date:20.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2997332
Date:23.03.2016
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2997332
Date:16.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.2014
ClassificationIPC:G01C21/34, G05D1/00, G08G1/0967, G08G1/0968, B60W30/182, B60W50/08, B60W50/14, B60W50/00
[2018/10]
CPC:
G08G1/096725 (EP,US); B60W40/04 (US); B60W50/08 (EP,US);
B60W50/14 (EP,US); B60W60/00136 (EP); B60W60/0021 (EP);
B60W60/0051 (US); G01C21/3407 (EP,US); G01C21/3461 (EP,US);
G01C21/3492 (US); G08G1/096844 (EP,US); B60W2050/0095 (EP,US);
B60W2554/00 (EP,US); B60W2554/406 (US); B60W2554/408 (US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/01]G01C21/34, G05D1/00, G08G1/0967, G08G1/0968, B60W30/182, B60W50/08, B60W50/14
Former IPC [2016/12]G01C21/34, G05D1/00, G08G1/0967, B60W30/182, B60W50/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NAVIGATIONSHILFE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT AUTOPILOTEN[2016/12]
English:NAVIGATION AID FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH AUTOPILOT[2016/12]
French:AIDE À LA NAVIGATION DESTINÉE À UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN PILOTAGE AUTOMATIQUE[2016/12]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2015National basic fee paid 
16.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/12]
13.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2018Fee for grant paid
27.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)17.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.04.2014
AL16.01.2019
CY16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
MK16.01.2019
MT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
TR16.01.2019
AT05.04.2019
IE05.04.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/34]HU05.04.2014
AL16.01.2019
CY16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
MT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
TR16.01.2019
AT05.04.2019
IE05.04.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2021/32]HU05.04.2014
AL16.01.2019
CY16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
TR16.01.2019
AT05.04.2019
IE05.04.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2021/26]AL16.01.2019
CY16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
TR16.01.2019
AT05.04.2019
IE05.04.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2020/51]AL16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
TR16.01.2019
AT05.04.2019
IE05.04.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2020/21]AL16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
TR16.01.2019
IE05.04.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2020/17]AL16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
TR16.01.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2020/11]AL16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SI16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2020/04]AL16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
LU05.04.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2020/02]AL16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/51]AL16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/49]AL16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/48]DK16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/46]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL16.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE19821163  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,14 * column 2, line 39 - line 55 * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 58 * * figure 1 *[I] 15;
 [XI]EP1308812  (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0085] , [0088] - [0095] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraphs [0109] , [0115] - [0127] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0148] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 15;
 [XI]DE10345559  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 15;
 [XI]DE102010001579  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,10,14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,5-9,11-13,15
ExaminationDE102009048954
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.