Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2981838

EP2981838 - FUNCTIONAL ELECTRONICS MODULE, OPERATING METHOD FOR A FUNCTIONAL ELECTRONICS MODULE AND SYSTEM HAVING A FUNCTIONAL ELECTRONICS MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/06]
Inventor(s)01 / WAKAN, Gunter
Amselweg 19
06311 Helbra / DE
02 / DREIFERT, Sascha
Goldener Grund 16B
33100 Paderborn / DE
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14715904.007.04.2014
[2016/06]
WO2014EP56949
Priority number, dateDE201320101455U05.04.2013         Original published format: DE 202013101455 U
[2016/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014162016
Date:09.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2981838
Date:10.02.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/327
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONSELEKTRONIKMODUL, BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN FUNKTIONSELEKTRONIKMODUL UND SYSTEM MIT EINEM FUNKTIONSELEKTRONIKMODUL[2016/06]
English:FUNCTIONAL ELECTRONICS MODULE, OPERATING METHOD FOR A FUNCTIONAL ELECTRONICS MODULE AND SYSTEM HAVING A FUNCTIONAL ELECTRONICS MODULE[2016/06]
French:MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE FONCTIONNEL, PROCÉDÉ POUR LE FAIRE FONCTIONNER ET SYSTÈME ÉQUIPÉ D'UN MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE FONCTIONNEL[2016/06]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2015National basic fee paid 
29.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
31.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2007222427  (TAKEUCHI TOSHIE [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,16,17,20,21 * sentences 15-17,26-51; figures 1,4-8 * [Y] 6,12,14 [I] 13,18,22;
 [XY]US2012022797  (MARUYAMA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0047] - [0062]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6,12,14;
 [X]WO2008000105  (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 8, line 25 - page 12, line 21; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2010161259  (KIM DEUK SOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0051] - [0063] - [0066] - [0098] - [0103]; figures 1,5 *;
 [X]US7336065  (HYATT GEOFFREY T [CA], et al) [X] 1,8,17,19 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 21; figure 1 *