Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2948063

EP2948063 - ULTRASOUND PROBE AND ULTRASOUND IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.03.2018  [2018/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2015/49]
Inventor(s)01 / SHAN, Caifeng
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / GELISSEN, Jozef Hubertus
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / MÄUELER, Sebastian
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/49]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/49]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date14715993.314.01.2014
[2015/49]
WO2014IB58248
Priority number, dateUS201361755090P22.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361755090 P
[2015/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014115056
Date:31.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2948063
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014
[2015/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/00
[2015/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
TitleGerman:ULTRASCHALLSONDE UND ULTRASCHALLBILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM[2015/49]
English:ULTRASOUND PROBE AND ULTRASOUND IMAGING SYSTEM[2015/49]
French:SONDE ULTRASONORE ET SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE ULTRASONORE[2015/49]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2015National basic fee paid 
24.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
26.01.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2011201937  (FUJII KIYOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0030] , [0031] , [0039] , [0063] , [0064] , [0072] , [0078] , [0094] - [0096]; figures 1,4,8,18 * [Y] 4,6-10,12-15 [I] 5;
 [XI]US2008097214  (MEYERS PAUL F [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0038] , [0061] , [0064] , [0065]; figures 1,2,15 * [I] 11;
 [XI]US2010125207  (KIM SEONG RAE [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0022] , [0027]; figures 1,2,3 * [I] 11;
 [XI]US2011112405  (BARTHE PETER G [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0074] , [0092]; figures 1,6,7 * [I] 11;
 [X]US2009030326  (KIM JUNG-HOE [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0028] - [0031] - [0037] , [0042] - [0047]; figures 2-4 *;
 [Y]WO2013005776  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]; TOSHIBA MEDICAL SYS CORP [JP]; KANAYAMA YUKO [JP]; KA) [Y] 4,6,7 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2009254779  (NIDEK KK) [Y] 8 * abstract *;
 [YA]US2012316407  (ANTHONY BRIAN W [US] ET AL) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0022] , [0032] , [0033] , [0039] , [0071] , [0085] , [0094] , [0095] , [0127]; figures 1,11 * [A] 4-7;
 [A]US2012083692  (STOLL JEFFREY [US]) [A] 4,6-9 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0048] , [0049] , [0052] , [0053] , [0060]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]KR101075878B  (HIRONIC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 4,6-9 * figure 2 *;
 [A]JP2010082053  (CROSSWELL KK) [A] 11-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - MASAHIKO KODA ET AL, "Sonographic subcutaneous and visceral fat indices represent the distribution of body fat volume", ABDOMINAL IMAGING, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20060901), vol. 32, no. 3, ISSN 1432-0509, pages 387 - 392, XP019539067 [Y] 12-15 * page 388, column right, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * page 391, column right, paragraph 2 * * abstract *
by applicant   - BELLESARI ET AL., "Sonographic measurement of adipose tissue", JOURNAL OF DIAGNOSTIC MEDICAL SONOGRAPHY, (199301), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 11 - 18
    - TORNAGHI ET AL., "Anthropometric or ultrasonic measurements in assessment of visceral fat? A comparative study", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY, (1994), pages 771 - 775
    - S. H. CONTRERAS ORTIZ, "Ultrasound image enhancement: A review", BIOMEDICAL SIGNAL PROCESSING AND CONTROL, (2012), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bspc.2012.02.002, pages 419 - 428, XP028404777

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bspc.2012.02.002
    - A. K. JAIN ET AL., "Object Matching Using Deformable Templates", IEEE TRANS. PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1996), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 267 - 278
    - ARMELLINI, F ET AL., "Measured and predicted total and visceral adipose tissue in women. Correlations with metabolic parameters", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY, (1994), vol. 18, pages 641 - 647, XP008170123