Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2988642

EP2988642 - SUCTION CLEANER WITH A DEDUSTING CONTROL FOR THE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/09]SUCTION-TYPE CLEANER WITH DEDUSTING CONTROL FOR THE FILTER OR THE FILTERS
[2017/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nilfisk A/S
Sognevej 25
2605 Brøndby / DK
[2017/47]
Former [2017/38]For all designated states
Nilfisk-Advance A/S
Sognevej 25
2605 Brøndby / DK
Former [2016/09]For all designated states
Nilfisk-Advance A/S
Sognevej 25
2605 Bröndby / DK
Inventor(s)01 / FÖNSS, Anders
Essendrupvej 76
DK-9260 Gistrup / DK
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2016/09]
Application number, filing date14716234.114.03.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014EP00710
Priority number, dateDE2013100718325.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013007183
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014173481
Date:30.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2988642
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2988642
Date:20.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47L9/20, A47L5/36
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHMUTZSAUGER MIT ABREINIGUNGSSTEUERUNG FÜR DEN ODER DIE FILTER[2016/09]
English:SUCTION CLEANER WITH A DEDUSTING CONTROL FOR THE FILTER[2017/20]
French:ASPIRATEUR AVEC UN COMMANDE D'UN ENSEMBLE DÉPOUSSIÈRAGE DU OU DES FILTRES[2017/20]
Former [2016/09]SUCTION-TYPE CLEANER WITH DEDUSTING CONTROL FOR THE FILTER OR THE FILTERS
Former [2016/09]ASPIRATEUR DE SALETÉS AVEC COMMANDE DE DÉCOLMATAGE POUR LE OU LES FILTRES
Entry into regional phase16.11.2015National basic fee paid 
16.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
18.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2017Fee for grant paid
16.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2017
Opposition(s)21.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
Former [2019/04]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
LU14.03.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/43]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/35]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/24]CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/23]CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Cited inInternational search[XD]DE10101219  (WAP REINIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [XD] 1-3,6,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE202010012821U  (NILFISK ADVANCE AS [DK]) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1656872  (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE10101219
 US2005011036
 US5347809