Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2981834

EP2981834 - CURRENT TRANSFORMER AND METHOD FOR CONVERTING A CONDUCTOR CURRENT FLOWING IN AN ELECTRICAL CONDUCTOR TO AN OUTPUT SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/06]
Inventor(s)01 / GERKENS, Michael
Haller Weg 43
33617 Bielefeld / DE
02 / HEGGEMANN, Christian
Kurt-Schumacher-Str. 85
32758 Detmold / DE
03 / SCHLINGMANN, Hans
Jahnstr. 13
32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14716262.231.03.2014
[2016/06]
WO2014EP56483
Priority number, dateDE20131010335004.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013103350
[2016/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014161826
Date:09.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2981834
Date:10.02.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01R15/20, H02M1/00
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
TitleGerman:STROMWANDLER UND VERFAHREN ZUM WANDELN EINES IN EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN LEITER FLIESSENDEN LEITERSTROMS IN EIN AUSGANGSSIGNAL[2016/06]
English:CURRENT TRANSFORMER AND METHOD FOR CONVERTING A CONDUCTOR CURRENT FLOWING IN AN ELECTRICAL CONDUCTOR TO AN OUTPUT SIGNAL[2016/06]
French:TRANSFORMATEUR DE COURANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION D'UN COURANT CIRCULANT DANS UN CONDUCTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE EN UN SIGNAL DE SORTIE[2016/06]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2015National basic fee paid 
23.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
25.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US4639665  (GARY JAMES R [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * column 1, line 52 - line 54 * * column 2, line 39 - line 58 * * column 3, line 6 - line 25 * * column 4, line 2 - line 10 *
 [Y]  - "Current transducer FHS 40-P/SP600 I PM = 0 -100 A Minisens Introduction", (20071231), pages 1 - 18, URL: http://www.lem.com/docs/products/fhs 40-p sp600.pdf, (20140612), XP055123111 [Y] 1-12 * page 1 - page 2 *
 [Y]  - "New Miniaturised Transducers for PCB-based Current Measurement", (20071231), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.power-mag.com/pdf/feature_pdf/1222952887_PEE_Issue_2_2007_Current_Transducers-New_Miniaturised_Transducers_for_PCB-based_Current_Measurement.pdf, (20140612), XP055123114 [Y] 1-12 * page 1 *
 [Y]  - "CAS / CASR / CKSR series Current Transducers. Insulated Highly Accurate Measurements from 1.5 to 50 Arms", (20090228), pages 1 - 24, URL: http://www.digikey.nl/Web Export/Supplier Content/LEM_398/PDF/LEM_CAS_CASR_CKSR.pdf?redirected=1, (20140612), XP055123116 [Y] 1-12 * page 3 * * page 8 *