EP2984226 - FABRIC FOR A MACHINE FOR PRODUCING WEB MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTON, Antony 8 Margerison Road Ben Rhydding Lancashire 298QU / GB | 02 /
ALLUM, Andrew 46 The Sidings Darwen Lancashire BB3 2BD / GB | 03 /
PONTON, David Stuart 4 East Park Av Darwen Lancashire BB3 2SQ / GB | 04 /
RIDING, Paul Raymond 162 Redlam Blackburn Lancashire BB2 1XQ / GB | [2016/09] |
Former [2016/07] | 01 /
MORTON, Antony 8 Margerison Road Ben Rhydding Lancashire 298QU / GB | ||
02 /
ALLUM, Andrew 46 The Sidings Darwen Lancashire BB3 2BD / GB | |||
03 /
PONTON, David Stuart 2 Heaning Avenue Knusden Blackburn Lancashire BB1 2AY / GB | |||
04 /
RIDING, Paul Raymond 162 Redlam Blackburn Lancashire BB2 1XQ / GB | Representative(s) | Keck, Hans-Georg Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Keck, Hans-Georg Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Poeltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 14716565.8 | 09.04.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014EP57130 | Priority number, date | DE201310206265 | 10.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013206265 | [2016/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014166984 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984226 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00, D21F11/00, B32B5/02, B32B37/24, B32B37/15 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
D21F11/006 (EP,US);
D21F7/083 (US);
D21F1/0027 (EP,US);
D21F7/08 (EP,US);
B32B2037/243 (EP,US);
B32B2309/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Title | German: | BESPANNUNG FÜR EINE MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BAHNMATERIAL | [2016/07] | English: | FABRIC FOR A MACHINE FOR PRODUCING WEB MATERIAL | [2016/07] | French: | ENTOILAGE POUR MACHINE DE PRODUCTION DE MATÉRIAU EN BANDE CONTINUE | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 14.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]CH537481 (STORA KOPPARBERGS BERGSLAGS AB [SE]) [X] 1 * column 2; figure 2 *[I] 2-11; | [XI]WO03040450 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1 * pages 31,45,46; figure 1b * [I] 2-11; | [XI]EP1690981 (VOITH FABRICS PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0029]; figure 2 * [I] 2-11; | [XI]US2009056899 (RINGER MARTIN [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0030] - [0032]; figure 4 * [I] 10 |