Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2970648

EP2970648 - POLYMER COMPOSITIONS, METHOD OF MANUFACTURE, AND ARTICLES FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SUN, Bin
1 Lexan Lane
Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620 / US
02 / KULKARNI, Amit S.
1 Lexan Lane
Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date14716715.914.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US27106
Priority number, dateUS20131383362915.03.2013         Original published format: US201313833629
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014152237
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2970648
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2970648
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08L51/04, C08L55/02, C08L69/00
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND DARAUS GEFORMTE ARTIKEL[2016/03]
English:POLYMER COMPOSITIONS, METHOD OF MANUFACTURE, AND ARTICLES FORMED THEREFROM[2016/03]
French:COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET ARTICLES FORMÉS À PARTIR DE CES DERNIÈRES[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2015National basic fee paid 
05.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
06.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2017Fee for grant paid
09.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2017
Opposition(s)28.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
LU14.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/23]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/10]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010130643  (ROHRBACH WILLIAM DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0069]; claims 1,6,7 *;
 [XI]US2012157630  (NAVARRO CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0056] , [0062] , [0063]; claims 1-3, 8, 10, 12, 13 * * paragraphs [0124] , [0125]; tables 2-4 * [I] 9,10;
 [A]US2010190913  (SEIDEL ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 1-10
by applicantUS7393896
 EP0900827
 US6784253
    - C. W. MACOSKO, RHEOLOGY-PRINCIPLES, MEASUREMENTS AND APPLICATIONS
    - R. W. WHORLOW, RHEOLOGICAL TECHNIQUES
    - J. A. BRYDSON, FLOW PROPERTIES OF POLYMER MELTS