Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2989685

EP2989685 - DIRECT PLUG-IN COMPRESSION SPRING TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.09.2019 [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 26
32758 Detmold / DE
[2019/35]
Former [2016/09]For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
Inventor(s)01 / CLASSEN, Constantin
Peckenweg 7
32758 Detmold / DE
02 / HERRMANN, Michael
Hinter den Pinneichen 11
32756 Detmold / DE
03 / STJEPANOVIC, Karlo
Libellenweg 12
33609 Bielefeld / DE
04 / SCHMIDTPOTT, Heike
Jahnstrasse 2A
32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE
05 / HORN, Dietmar
Am Königsbach 1b
32825 Blomberg / DE
06 / ZIEMKE, Jürgen
Bollweg 2a
32760 Detmold / DE
[2019/36]
Former [2016/09]01 / CLASSEN, Constantin
Peckenweg 7
32758 Detmold / DE
02 / HERRMANN, Michael
Hinter den Pinneichen 11
32756 Detmold / DE
03 / STJEPANOVIC, Karlo
Hofstrasse 45
33607 Bielefeld / DE
04 / SCHMIDTPOTT, Heike
Jahnstrasse 2A
32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE
05 / HORN, Dietmar
Am Königsbach 1b
32825 Blomberg / DE
06 / ZIEMKE, Jürgen
Bollweg 2a
32760 Detmold / DE
Representative(s)Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2016/09]
Application number, filing date14716860.314.04.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014EP57511
Priority number, dateDE201320101751U23.04.2013         Original published format: DE 202013101751 U
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014173717
Date:30.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2989685
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2016/09]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2989685
Date:04.09.2019
Language:DE
[2019/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/48
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIREKTSTECK-DRUCKFEDERKLEMME[2016/09]
English:DIRECT PLUG-IN COMPRESSION SPRING TERMINAL[2016/09]
French:BORNE À RESSORT À INSERTION DIRECTE[2016/09]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2015National basic fee paid 
02.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
08.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2019Fee for grant paid
23.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE202008014469U  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [X] 1-6,13,14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 7 [I] 9,10,15;
 [X]DE202005005369U  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,11,12 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]DE29818571U  (STOCKO METALLWARENFAB HENKELS [DE]) [Y] 7 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure 1 *
by applicantEP1353407