EP2964784 - POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LGC Genomics Limited Queens Road Teddington Middlesex TW11 0LY / GB | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN, Nisha LGC Genomics Limited Units 1 & 2 Trident Industrial Estate Pindar Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 0WZ / GB | 02 /
HOLME, John Edmond LGC Genomics Limited Units 1 & 2 Trident Industrial Estate Pindar Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 0WZ / GB | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2016/02] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14717167.2 | 05.03.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014GB50650 | Priority number, date | GB20130004030 | 06.03.2013 Original published format: GB 201304030 | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014135872 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2964784 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2964784 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6858 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6818 (GB,US);
C12N15/11 (GB);
C12Q1/686 (GB);
C12Q2527/107 (GB);
C12Q2549/00 (GB);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2527/107, C12Q2565/101 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/02] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSSYSTEM FÜR POLYMERASEKETTENREAKTION | [2019/14] | English: | POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION DETECTION SYSTEM | [2016/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION POUR LA RÉACTION EN CHAÎNE PAR POLYMÉRASE | [2019/14] |
Former [2016/02] | DETEKTIONSSYSTEM FÜR POLYMERASE-KETTENREAKTIONEN | ||
Former [2016/02] | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE RÉACTION EN CHAÎNE DE LA POLYMÉRASE | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 19.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9949293 (BOSTON PROBES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,10-15,20,21 * the whole document * * Figs. 1A, 2; p. 26, l. 30-33; p. 25, l. 5-26; examples 15-17 * [I] 1-21; | [A]EP1666609 (QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INVEST INC [US]) [A] 9,19 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2006119326 (STRATAGENE CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-15,20 * the whole document * * Fig. 2; p. 20, l. 11-22;. p. 12, l. 19-27; p. 23, l. 5-14; p. 13, l. 22-24 * [I] 1-21; | [AD]EP1726664 (KBIOSCIENCES LTD [GB]) [AD] 7 * the whole document *; | [ADP]WO2013140107 (LGC GENOMICS LTD [GB], et al) [ADP] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A] - NORONHA DE C M C ET AL, "AMPLIMERS WITH 3'-TERMINAL PHOSPHOROTHIOATE LINKAGES RESIST DEGRADATION BY VENT POLYMERASE AND REDUCE TAQ POLYMERASE MISPRIMING", PCR METHODS & APPLICATIONS, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, US, (19921101), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 1054-9803, pages 131 - 136, XP000600686 [A] 16,17 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2012154876 | by applicant | WO0142505 | WO0186001 | EP1726664 | - MORETTI, T. ET AL., "Enhancement of PCR amplification yield and specificity using AmpliTaq Gold DNA polymerase", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1998), vol. 25, pages 716 - 22 | - "Hot Start PCR with heat-activatable primers: a novel approach for improved PCR performance", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2008), vol. 36, no. 20, page E131 | - BRAITHWAITE; ITO, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 787 - 802 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 2216 - 2220 | WO2012GB50645 |