Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2970350

EP2970350 - ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DEOXY SUGAR ANTIMETABOLITES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
For all designated states
The Forsyth Institute
245 First Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/07]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
For all designated states
The Forsyth Institute
245 First Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
For all designated states
The Forsyth Institute
140 The Fenway
Boston, MA 02115 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAEFFER-KORBYLO, Lyndsay
24 Clearbrook Lane
Flemington, NJ 08822 / US
02 / FRIAS-LOPEZ, Jorge
115 Vermont Street
Boston, MA 02132 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date14717330.613.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US26013
Priority number, dateUS201361792953P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361792953 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014151567
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2970350
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07H3/08, A61K8/49, A61Q11/00, C07H5/02, C07H5/06, A61K31/70, A61K31/7004, A61K31/7008, A61P31/04
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:MUNDPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DESOXY-ZUCKER-ANTIMETABOLITEN[2016/03]
English:ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DEOXY SUGAR ANTIMETABOLITES[2016/03]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE SOIN BUCCAL CONTENANT DES ANTIMÉTABOLITES DÉSOXY SUCRES[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2015National basic fee paid 
14.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
14.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XDA]EP0055109  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [XD] 16-26 * Claims, in particular claims 1 and 5-7; Page 7 lines 15-16; Examples of compositions pages 9-10 * [A] 1-15,27,28;
 [Y]WO2011019342  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * Claims and examples *;
 [Y]JP2006347941  (KAO CORP) [Y] 1-28 * Claims and examples *;
 [Y]US2007166242  (KROSS ROBERT D [US]) [Y] 1-28 * Claims and paragraphs [12], [17], [31] and [33] *;
 [Y]EP2098227  (MATSUTANI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-28 * Claims, in particular claims 1 and 3-6, and examples *;
 [IP]KR20130063887  (UNIV YEUNGNAM IACF [KR]) [IP] 1-28 * Claims and description *
 [XDA]  - FITZGERAL ET AL., "Inhibition of Caries in hamsters by 2-Deoxy-D-glucose", J. DENT. RES., (1977), vol. 56, no. 11, pages 1431 - 1431, XP009178230 [XD] 16-22 * the whole document * [A] 1-15,23-28

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/00220345770560113501