Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2974356

EP2974356 - SLIM PROFILE LOUDSPEAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THX Ltd
1255 Battry Street
Suite 100
San Francisco, CA 94111 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / FINCHAM, Lawrence, R.
1255 Battery Street
Suite 100
San Francisco, CA 94111 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14717912.110.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US22866
Priority number, dateUS201361780521P13.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361780521 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014164573
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2974356
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/02, H04R1/40, H04R5/02, H04R1/28
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:FLACHER LAUTSPRECHER[2016/03]
English:SLIM PROFILE LOUDSPEAKER[2016/03]
French:HAUT-PARLEUR COMPACT[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2015National basic fee paid 
23.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
28.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2019
27.11.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US5561717  (LAMM MICHAEL E [US]) [X] 1-6,9,10,12-15,38 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 64 * * figures 1,4-6 * [A] 7,8,16-37,42 [Y] 11,41;
 [XAY]US5850460  (TANAKA SHOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,12-35,38-40 * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 31 * * column 10, line 4 - column 12, line 24 * * column 16, line 63 - column 7, line 49 * * figures 4,5,13 * [A] 7,8,36,37,42 [Y] 11,41