EP2994198 - HAIR TREATMENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Qunhua Unilever (China) Company Limited Shanghai Branch 66 LinXin Road Linkong Economic Development Zone Changing District Shanghai 200335 / CN | 02 /
JAYASWAL, Amit Unilever (China) Company Limited Shanghai Branch 66 LinXin Road Linkong Economic Development Zone Changing District Shanghai 200335 / CN | 03 /
LING, Zihui Unilever (China) Company Limited Shanghai Branch 66 LinXin Road Linkong Economic Development Zone Changing District Shanghai 200335 / CN | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 14718395.8 | 16.04.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014EP57761 | Priority number, date | WO2013CN75418 | 09.05.2013 Original published format: PCT/CN2013/075418 | EP20130173685 | 26.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13173685 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014180640 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994198 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2994198 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61Q5/00, A61K8/46, A61K8/36, A61Q19/08, A61Q19/10 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A61K8/466 (EP,EA,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,EA,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,EA,US);
A61K8/463 (EA,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,EA,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,EA,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,EA,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HAARBEHANDLUNG | [2019/03] | English: | HAIR TREATMENT COMPOSITION | [2016/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT CAPILLAIRE | [2019/03] |
Former [2016/11] | HAARBEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2016/11] | COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT CAPILLAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 03.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2014 | AL | 05.06.2019 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | ES | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | NL | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.04.2014 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2008153727 (TSAUR LIANG SHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0142] * [Y] 1-15; | [X]WO2006002892 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,13-15 * page 33 - page 36 * * page 2 - page 3 * * page 7, line 6 - line 17 *; | [Y]US6183757 (BEERSE PETER WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 10, line 28 - line 39 * * sentence 30, paragraph 19 - sentence 35 *; | [Y]WO2009030594 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 30 - page 34 *; | [Y]WO2009077495 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 23 - page 27 *; | [Y]WO2010034721 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 18 * * page 27 - page 30 *; | [XP]WO2013150300 (INNOSPEC LTD [GB]) [XP] 1 * page 36; example 9 * | Examination | US5227086 | US5225097 | by applicant | WO9206154 | US5194639 | WO9631188 |