Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2965594

EP2965594 - METHOD FOR GENERATING AN ELECTRIC ARC WHICH DIRECTLY, AREALLY, THERMALLY AND MECHANICALLY ACTS ON A MATERIAL, AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING SAID ELECTRIC ARC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/02]GENERATING ELECTRIC ARC, WHICH DIRECTLY AREALLY THERMALLY AND MECHANICALLY ACTS ON MATERIAL, AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRIC ARC
[2017/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI, SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GA Drilling, a. s.
Priemyselná 5
917 01 Trnava / SK
[2018/44]
Former [2016/02]For all designated states
GA Drilling, a. s.
Piest'anská 3
917 01 Trnava / SK
Inventor(s)01 / KOCIS, Ivan
Kuklovská 54
841 04 Bratislava / SK
02 / HORVÁTH, Gabriel
Záhradnícka 6406/51
929 01 Dunajská Streda / SK
03 / DVONC, Lukás
Horská 1314/46
958 06 Partizánske / SK
 [2017/47]
Former [2016/02]01 / KOCIS, Ivan
Kuklovská 54
841 04 Bratislava / SK
02 / HORVÁTH, Gabriel
Esterházyovcov 362/8
956 04 Vozokany / SK
03 / DVONC, Lukás
Horská 1314/46
958 06 Partizánske / SK
Representative(s)Litváková, Lenka
Litváková a spol., s.r.o.
Sliacska 1/A
831 02 Bratislava / SK
[N/P]
Former [2016/02]Litvakova, Lenka
Litváková a spol.
Patent, Trademark and Expert Agency
Pluhova 78
831 03 Bratislava / SK
Application number, filing date14718791.804.03.2014
[2016/02]
WO2014SK50006
Priority number, dateSK2013005000605.03.2013         Original published format: SK 500062013
[2016/02]
Filing languageSK
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014137299
Date:12.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2965594
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014
[2016/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2965594
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:E21B7/15, H05H1/50
[2017/14]
Former International [2016/02]H05H1/50, H05H1/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LICHTBOGENS MIT DIREKTER RÄUMLICHER, THERMISCHER UND MECHANISCHER WIRKUNG AUF MATERIAL UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LICHTBOGENS DAZU[2017/14]
English:METHOD FOR GENERATING AN ELECTRIC ARC WHICH DIRECTLY, AREALLY, THERMALLY AND MECHANICALLY ACTS ON A MATERIAL, AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING SAID ELECTRIC ARC[2017/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN ARC ÉLECTRIQUE QUI AGIT DE MANIÈRE MÉCANIQUE, THERMIQUE, SURFACIQUE, ET DIRECTE SUR UN MATÉRIAU, ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE CET ARC ÉLECTRIQUE[2017/14]
Former [2016/02]ERZEUGUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LICHTBOGENS MIT DIREKTER RÄUMLICHER, THERMISCHER UND MECHANISCHER WIRKUNG AUF MATERIAL UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LICHTBOGENS
Former [2016/02]GENERATING ELECTRIC ARC, WHICH DIRECTLY AREALLY THERMALLY AND MECHANICALLY ACTS ON MATERIAL, AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRIC ARC
Former [2016/02]GÉNÉRATION D'ARC ÉLECTRIQUE, QUI AGIT DE MANIÈRE MÉCANIQUE, THERMIQUE, SURFACIQUE, ET DIRECTE SUR UN MATÉRIAU, ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ARC ÉLECTRIQUE
Entry into regional phase01.10.2015National basic fee paid 
01.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/02]
18.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.11.2017Fee for grant paid
13.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2017
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE04.03.2018
LU04.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE04.03.2018
LU04.03.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2019/04]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
LU04.03.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102011053106  (INDUSTRIEANLAGEN BETR SGMBH [DE]; SGE SPEZIALGERAETEENTWICKLUNG GMBH [) [A] 1,2,11,21,23-26,28 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - ITO ET AL., "Low-temperature sintering of indium tin oxide thin film using split gliding arc plasma", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1 (REGULAR PAPERS, SHORT NOTES & REVIEW PAPERS), Japan, (200808), vol. 47, no. 8, doi:10.1143/JJAP.47.6956, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 6956 - 6959, XP002726931 [I] 1,2,4-6,9,14 * paragraph [02.2]; figure 1a *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.47.6956
 [A]  - GANGOLI S P ET AL, "A non-equilibrium plasma source: magnetically stabilized gliding arc discharge: I. Design and diagnostics", PLASMA SOURCES SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20101201), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0963-0252, page 65003, XP020182553 [A] 1-3,7,9-13,18,19,24,28 * paragraph [0002] *
 [A]  - FRIDMAN ET AL., "Characteristics of gliding arc and its application in combustion enhancement", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, USA, (200811), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.2514/1.24795, ISSN 0748-4658, pages 1216 - 1228, XP002726932 [A] 1,24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2514/1.24795
 [A]  - OMBRELLO ET AL., "Kinetic ignition enhancement of diffusion flames by nonequilibrium magnetic gliding arc plasma", AIAA JOURNAL, USA, (200010), vol. 46, no. 10, doi:10.2514/1.33005, ISSN 0001-1452, pages 2424 - 2433, XP002726933 [A] 1,24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2514/1.33005