Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2989642

EP2989642 - CONDUCTOR MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 30.01.2019  [2019/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/09]
Inventor(s)01 / WIENEKE, Andreas
Hummerntruperstr. 34A
32657 Lemgo / DE
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2016/09]
Application number, filing date14718984.923.04.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014EP58189
Priority number, dateDE201320101786U25.04.2013         Original published format: DE 202013101786 U
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014173926
Date:30.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2989642
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2989642
Date:30.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01B7/36, G09F3/06, G09F3/20, G09F3/16
[2018/38]
Former International [2016/09]H01B7/36, G09F3/06, G09F3/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEITERMARKIERER[2016/09]
English:CONDUCTOR MARKER[2016/09]
French:REPÈRE DE CÂBLE[2016/09]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2015National basic fee paid 
05.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
21.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2018Fee for grant paid
13.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2004035029  (FORSBERG KEVIN [US]) [X] 1,2,6,10 * paragraphs [0030] , [0035] * * figures 3A, 3B * [I] 3-5,7-9,11,12;
 [A]GB2462110  (O'CONNELL JACQUELINE A [GB]) [A] 8,9,11 * page 6, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]DE9319182U  (IDENTO IND KENNZEICHNUNG [DE]) [A] 12 * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE102007018125  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0030] , [0035] * * figures 1,2,4 *
by applicantDE102009014694
 EP1596472