blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2989388

EP2989388 - DOMESTIC SMALL FIRING SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED VENTILATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/09]SMALL FIRING SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED VENTILATION AND CYCLONIC COMBUSTION CHAMBER
[2023/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastr. 27c
80686 München / DE
[2022/16]
Former [2016/09]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastraße 27c
80636 Munich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ALEYSA, Mohammadshayesh
Wegaweg 6
70565 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/09]
Application number, filing date14719341.125.04.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014EP58521
Priority number, dateDE20131020772426.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013207724
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2014174104
Date:30.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2989388
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2989388
Date:27.03.2024
Language:DE
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.2014
ClassificationIPC:F23G5/16, F23G5/027
[2016/09]
CPC:
F23G5/027 (EP,US); F23B10/02 (EP,US); F23B90/06 (EP,US);
F23G5/16 (EP,US); F23G5/50 (EP,US); F23N3/002 (US);
F23N2900/05002 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HÄUSLICHE KLEINFEUERUNGSANLAGE MIT VERBESSERTER LÜFTUNG[2023/45]
English:DOMESTIC SMALL FIRING SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED VENTILATION[2023/45]
French:DISPOSITIF DOMESTIQUE DE COMBUSTION DE TAILLE RÉDUITE À VENTILATION AMÉLIORÉE[2023/45]
Former [2016/09]KLEINFEUERUNGSANLAGE MIT VERBESSERTER LÜFTUNG UND ZYKLONARTIGER BRENNKAMMER
Former [2016/09]SMALL FIRING SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED VENTILATION AND CYCLONIC COMBUSTION CHAMBER
Former [2016/09]DISPOSITIF DE COMBUSTION DE TAILLE RÉDUITE À VENTILATION AMÉLIORÉE ET CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION DE TYPE CYCLONE
Entry into regional phase19.10.2015National basic fee paid 
19.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
05.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2024Fee for grant paid
15.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 09
22.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0229326  (SWEDISH BIOBURNER SYST AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 2 - line 28; figure 1 * [Y] 3-6,9-11;
 [XY]WO2008068781  (EINARSSON FRIDFINNUR [IS]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 4, line 1 - page 12, line 2; figure 1; claim 16 * [Y] 3-6,9-11;
 [Y]EP2078555  (VON ROLL UMWELTTECHNIK AG [CH]) [Y] 10,11 * sentence 0019 - sentence 0031; figure 1 *;
 [XY]DE102010021370  (WERKSTAETTEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 3-6,9-11;
 [Y]EP2426414  (RUS EGON [AT], et al) [Y] 3-6,10,11* the whole document *;
 [Y]US2012125241  (SEE PHIL [US]) [Y] 10,11 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *
ExaminationUS4545360
 US2008035137
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.