Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2974404

EP2974404 - OUTPUT MANAGEMENT FOR PRESS-TO-TRANSMIT COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / KERGER, Kameron Noell
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LINDNER, Mark Aaron
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / KONERTZ, Anne Katrin
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14719409.611.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US23153
Priority number, dateUS20131379645512.03.2013         Original published format: US201313796455
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014164662
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2974404
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/10, H04L29/06
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:AUSGABEVERWALTUNG IN PUSH-TO-TALK-KOMMUNIKATIONEN[2016/03]
English:OUTPUT MANAGEMENT FOR PRESS-TO-TRANSMIT COMMUNICATIONS[2016/03]
French:GESTION DE SORTIE POUR COMMUNICATIONS DE MESSAGERIE INSTANTANÉE VOCALE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2015National basic fee paid 
27.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
24.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/47]
05.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010323669  (MAGGENTI MARK [US] ET AL) [X] 1-88 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0067] *;
 [X]US2006171351  (WILD JOHANNA A [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-88 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 5] , [00 6] , [0 17] - [0019] - [0 33] - [0044] *