EP2969794 - VENTED BEVERAGE CAN AND CAN END [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Packaging Technology, Inc 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEANE, Brendan 1040 Chestnut Street Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | 02 /
FIELDS, Brian 1171 Camelot Lane Lemont, IL 60439 / US | 03 /
DOSHI, Vivek 210 West Hill Street Apartment 3 Chicago, IL 60610 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14719891.5 | 10.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US22524 | Priority number, date | US201361782316P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361782316 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014159208 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2969794 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2969794 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D17/28, B65D17/32 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
B65D17/4012 (EP,US);
B65D51/1683 (US);
B65D51/1672 (US);
B65D2517/0014 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0062 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0082 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0094 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | B65D17/00, B65D17/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELÜFTETE GETRÄNKEDOSE UND DOSENENDE | [2016/03] | English: | VENTED BEVERAGE CAN AND CAN END | [2016/03] | French: | CANETTE DE BOISSON VENTILEE ET EXTREMITE DE CANETTE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 09.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2022 | AT | 15.06.2022 | CZ | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | NL | 15.06.2022 | RO | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SE | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | BG | 15.09.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | PT | 17.10.2022 | LU | 10.03.2023 | [2024/02] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5011037 (MOEN BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-29,40-46 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001018960 (HOKKAI CAN) [A] 1-46* the whole document *; | [X]WO2008023983 (4SIGHT INNOVATION BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010018976 (CHRISTIAN ALLEN B [US], et al) [A] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011056946 (EMANUELE III ARTHUR JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,30-39,46 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011266281 (THIEMANN DANIEL ALAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,7,30-39,46 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012199587 (NORRIS KIRK [US]) [X] 1-3,46 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6079583 | US2001021281 | US6354453 |