Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2984145

EP2984145 - METHOD FOR HYDRAULICALLY FRACTURING A SUBTERRANEAN FORMATION USING UREA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.04.2018  [2018/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wintershall Holding GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 160
34119 Kassel / DE
[2016/07]
Inventor(s)01 / STEHLE, Vladimir
Bunte Berna 6
34123 Kassel / DE
 [2016/07]
Representative(s)Baier, Martin
Ellwanger & Baier
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Friedrichsplatz 9
68165 Mannheim / DE
[2016/07]
Application number, filing date14720056.209.04.2014
[2016/07]
WO2014EP57180
Priority number, dateEP2013016310110.04.2013         Original published format: EP 13163101
EP2013017457801.07.2013         Original published format: EP 13174578
[2016/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014167013
Date:16.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2984145
Date:17.02.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014
[2016/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:C09K8/52, C09K8/60, C09K8/68, C09K8/88, C09K8/524, C09K8/86
[2016/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HYDRAULISCHEN FRACKEN EINER UNTERIRDISCHEN FORMATION UNTER VERWENDUNG VON HARNSTOFF[2016/07]
English:METHOD FOR HYDRAULICALLY FRACTURING A SUBTERRANEAN FORMATION USING UREA[2016/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FRACTURATION HYDRAULIQUE D'UNE FORMATION SOUTERRAINE AU MOYEN D'URÉE[2016/07]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2015National basic fee paid 
10.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/07]
25.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/15]
30.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010298177  (ROBB IAN D [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] - [0029] , [0046]; claims 1,2 * [I] 7;
 [X]US2011207633  (MILLER RICHARD F [US]) [X] 1,4,12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0046]; claims 14,17,23 *;
 [X]US3195635  (FAST CLARENCE R) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,6 *;
 [A]US2012305255  (ZAVOLZHSKIY VICTOR BORISOVICH [RU] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0057] , [0062] - [0070] - [0073] , [0084] , [0088]; claims 1,5-10,12,13 *;
 [A]EP2537910  (WINTERSHALL HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,6,15 *;
 [A]US7946342  (ROBERTSON ERIC P [US]) [A] 14 * claims 1,2,4 *;
 [A]US3270815  (OLIVER OSBORN ET AL) [A] 14 * example 1; claim 1 *