Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2984145 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2984145



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 324
14.03.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.03.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
30.11.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
12.12.2016 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
12.12.2016 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 12
27.07.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
27.04.2016 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
25.04.2016 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
20.01.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.12.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
07.12.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.10.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
11.10.2015 Comments on Written Opinion of ISA Search / examination 6
21.08.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.05.2015 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
08.05.2015 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.05.2015 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
08.05.2015 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.05.2015 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.04.2015 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
01.04.2015 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
31.03.2015 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
31.03.2015 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
31.03.2015 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
06.02.2015 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.02.2015 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.02.2015 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.01.2015 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2015 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.12.2014 Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.12.2014 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.12.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
16.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.12.2014 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
11.12.2014 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.12.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
11.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.12.2014 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
06.11.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
06.11.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
16.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
16.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
16.10.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33
25.06.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
25.06.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
25.06.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
09.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
09.04.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
09.04.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
09.04.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 28
09.04.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1
09.04.2014 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 32
09.04.2014 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 33