Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2984145


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.03.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
29.11.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.06.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
17.06.2016 Change - extension states published on  20.07.2016  [2016/29]
04.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
15.01.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.01.2016 Request for examination filed published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
01.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
27.10.2015 Change - representative
27.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication