Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2984145
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2984145Global Dossier 17.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP57180 09.04.2014
EP13174578 01.07.2013
EP13163101 10.04.2013
EP14720056 09.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2908791 16.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP57180 09.04.2014
EP13174578 01.07.2013
EP13163101 10.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2015147997 16.05.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP57180 09.04.2014
EP13174578 01.07.2013
EP13163101 10.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014167013Global Dossier 16.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13174578 01.07.2013
EP13163101 10.04.2013