Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2994010

EP2994010 - CONNECTING DEVICE FOR A MOVABLE FURNITURE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / WEIDLICH, Jürgen
Albert Einsteinstraße 5
32289 Rödinghausen / DE
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/11]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14721421.707.05.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014EP59330
Priority number, dateDE20131010483010.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013104830
[2016/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014180900
Date:13.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2994010
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/04
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN BEWEGBARES MÖBELTEIL[2016/11]
English:CONNECTING DEVICE FOR A MOVABLE FURNITURE PART[2016/11]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON POUR ÉLÉMENT DE MEUBLE MOBILE[2016/11]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2015National basic fee paid 
01.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
28.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2310997  (BERNSTEIN GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012079793  (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]; SALICE LUCIANO [IT]) [A] 1-18 * page 7, paragraph l - page 8, line 1 * * figure - *;
 [A]WO2011094776  (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]; HOLZER ANDREAS [AT]; HAEMMERLE KURT [AT]) [A] 1-18 * figure - *