Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2981305

EP2981305 - MATERIALS, SYSTEMS, DEVICES, AND METHODS FOR ENDOLUMINAL ELECTROPOLYMERIC PAVING AND SEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of the University of Arizona
220 W. Sixth Street
4th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
[2019/24]
Former [2016/06]For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of the University of Arizona
220 W. Sixth Street
4th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SLEPIAN, Marvin J.
5001 North Summit Ridge Road
Tucson, AZ 85750 / US
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Gill, Siân Victoria , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/24]
Former [2016/06]Heare, Tanya , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14721704.604.04.2014
[2016/06]
WO2014US33078
Priority number, dateUS201361808545P04.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361808545 P
[2016/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014165822
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2981305
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2981305
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61L31/04, A61L31/14, A61L31/16, A61B5/00, A61N1/372, A61F2/945
[2018/51]
Former International [2016/06]A61L31/14, A61L31/16, A61F2/945
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MATERIALIEN, SYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR ENDOLUMINALE ELEKTROPOLYMERE PFLASTERUNG UND VERSIEGELUNG[2016/06]
English:MATERIALS, SYSTEMS, DEVICES, AND METHODS FOR ENDOLUMINAL ELECTROPOLYMERIC PAVING AND SEALING[2016/06]
French:MATÉRIAUX, SYSTÈMES, DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE PAVAGE ET L'ENROBAGE ÉLECTROPOLYMÈRES ENDOLUMINAUX[2016/06]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2015National basic fee paid 
29.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
23.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2019Fee for grant paid
18.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP1847217  (ENDOLUMINAL THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6-14,16-19,21-25,28,29 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0031] * [Y] 3-5,20,26,27 [I] 15;
 [Y]US5634946  (SLEPIAN MARVIN J [US]) [Y] 3,20 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, lines 21-33 *;
 [Y]US6290729  (SLEPIAN MARVIN J [US] ET AL) [Y] 4,5,20,26,27 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, lines 5-12 *;
 [A]US2011237921  (ASKIN III ROBERT E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] *
 [Y]  - SLEPIAN M J, "POLYMERIC ENDOLUMINAL PAVING. ÖA FAMILY OF EVOLVING METHODS FOR EXTENDING ENDOLUMINAL THERAPEUTICS BEYOND STENTING", CARDIOLOGY CLINICS, W.B. SAUNDERS COMPANY, PHILADELPHIA, US, (19941101), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 0733-8651, pages 715 - 737, XP000560952 [Y] 3-5,20,26,27 * page 720, column l, line 36 - column r, line 5 * * page 720, column r, lines 21-39 * * page 725, column l, line 25 - column r, line 4 * * page 725, column r, line 28 - page 726, column l, line 13 *
by applicantUS4655771
 US3868956
 US3829506
 US3535307
 US3036118
 US2979578
 US2677700
 US2675619
 US4938763
 US6890300
 US8336387
 US5863024
 US5807258
 US5797898
    - ALBERTSSON ET AL., POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, (1987), vol. 18, pages 73 - 87
    - AVICHAT, "Recent Investigations of Plant Based Natural Gums, Mucilages and Resins in Novel Drug Delivery Systems", IND. J. PHARM. EDU. RES., (2010), vol. 24, no. A, pages 86 - 99
    - "Corrosion of Metals", RICKER ET AL., Evaluation of Alternative In-Flight Fire Suppressants for Full-Scale Testing in Simulated Aircraft Engine Nacelles and Dry Bays. Section, NIST, (1994), pages 669 - 728
    - DAGDEVIREN ET AL., "Conformal piezoelectric energy harvesting and storage from motions of the heart, lung, and diaphragm", PNAS, (2014), vol. 111, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1317233111, pages 1927 - 1932, XP055126152

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1317233111
    - HERMAN ET AL., CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 15, pages 117 - 124
    - ASHTON, "Polymeric endoaortic paving: Mechanical, thermoforming, and degradation properties of polycaprolactone/polyurethane blends for cardiovascular applications", ACTA BIOMATERIALIA, (2011), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.actbio.2010.09.004, pages 287 - 94, XP027448770

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actbio.2010.09.004