Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2994013

EP2994013 - PULL-OUT GUIDE WITH A DAMPING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/11]DRAWER SLIDE AND DAMPING ELEMENT FOR A DRAWER SLIDE
[2018/41]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / KÖNIG, Sebastian
Gutenbergstr. 6
32257 Bünde / DE
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/52]
Former [2016/11]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14721885.307.05.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014EP59319
Priority number, dateDE20131010473207.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013104732
[2016/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014180891
Date:13.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2994013
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2994013
Date:26.12.2018
Language:DE
[2018/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/473
[2018/41]
Former International [2016/11]A47B88/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG MIT EINEM DÄMPFUNGSELEMENT[2018/41]
English:PULL-OUT GUIDE WITH A DAMPING ELEMENT[2018/41]
French:SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE TÉLESCOPIQUE AVEC ÉLÉMENT D'AMORTISSEMENT[2018/41]
Former [2016/11]AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG UND DÄMPFUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINE AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG
Former [2016/11]DRAWER SLIDE AND DAMPING ELEMENT FOR A DRAWER SLIDE
Former [2016/11]SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE TÉLESCOPIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT D'AMORTISSEMENT POUR SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE TÉLESCOPIQUE
Entry into regional phase01.12.2015National basic fee paid 
01.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
28.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2018
19.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.11.2018Fee for grant paid
15.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
[2019/33]
Former [2019/30]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US3588198  (STEWART EDWARD C, et al) [A] 1-14 * column 6, line 73 - column 7, line 20; figures 5, 8-11 *;
 [A]DE202005014127U  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0031]; figure - *;
 [A]EP2353448  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] * * figures 4-10 *
ExaminationDE4104271
 DE10154274
by applicantDE202005014050U
 DE102010042180