Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2974516

EP2974516 - RECEIVER-ONLY TUNE-AWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / HSU, Chih-Ping
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / USMANI, Farrukh
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / HANG, Ling
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / JEENAGALA, Rajagopal
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/42]
Former [2016/03]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14722038.814.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US28492
Priority number, dateUS20131383169115.03.2013         Original published format: US201313831691
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014144192
Date:18.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2974516
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2974516
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/04, // H04W88/06, H04W76/02
[2017/06]
Former International [2016/03]H04W88/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ALLEINIGE WEGSCHALTUNG EINES VERSTÄRKERS[2016/03]
English:RECEIVER-ONLY TUNE-AWAY[2016/03]
French:CHANGEMENT DE SYNTONISATION DU SEUL RÉCEPTEUR[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2015National basic fee paid 
29.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
21.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
06.09.2017Fee for grant paid
06.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.02.2017
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
06.09.2017Request for further processing filed
06.09.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.09.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
LU14.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2012020310  (JI TINGFANG [US], et al) [X] 1,10,20,30 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0042] , [0043] , [0048] , [0049] , [0065] , [0071] * * figures 7,8 * [Y] 2,4,5,9,11,12,14,15,19,21,22,24,25,29,31,33,34,38 [I] 3,6-8,13,16-18,23,26-28,32,35-37;
 [Y]US2009213765  (RINNE MIKA P [FI], et al) [Y] 2,12,22,31 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0023] - [0033] *;
 [Y]US2011217969  (SPARTZ MICHAEL K [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,9,11,14,15,19,21,24,25,29,33,34,38 * paragraphs [0040] - [0045] * * figure 5 *;
 [XP]EP2605554  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [XP] 1,10,20,30 * paragraph [0061] * * figure 5 *