Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812036

EP2812036 - STERILE STATUS INDICATOR BY MEANS OF PHASE CHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aesculap AG
Am Aesculap-Platz
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Aesculap AG
Am Aesculap-Platz
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MOTZ, Corvin
Hausener Strasse 26
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
02 / ZIERIS, Gerold
Tannenweg 14
78570 Mülheim / DE
03 / AMANN, Joachim
Am Greithof 6
78357 Mühlingen-Zoznegg / DE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date14722650.006.05.2014
WO2014EP59242
Priority number, dateDE20131020833207.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013208332
[2014/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014180849
Date:13.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812036
Date:17.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812036
Date:22.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01N31/22, A61L2/28
[2015/05]
Former International [2014/51]A61L2/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STERILANZEIGE DURCH PHASENWECHSEL[2014/51]
English:STERILE STATUS INDICATOR BY MEANS OF PHASE CHANGE[2014/51]
French:INDICATEUR DE STÉRILITÉ PAR CHANGEMENT DE PHASE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2014National basic fee paid 
11.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
05.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2015Fee for grant paid
10.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)25.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.05.2014
AL22.07.2015
BG22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU06.05.2014
BG22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2018/32]HU06.05.2014
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2018/30]HU06.05.2014
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2018/29]HU06.05.2014
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2017/41]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/21]DK22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/20]DK22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT22.07.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0186289  (JP LAB INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 4; claims 1-2 *;
 [A]WO2008041146  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]WO2012135694  (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [A] 1,3,8 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2012095605  (TRAN BAO Q [US]) [A] 1 * claim 11 *