blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2964685

EP2964685 - COBALT AND MANGANESE BASED URETHANIZED POLYMERS FOR AIR DRYING POLYMER-BASED COATINGS, PAINTS AND INKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2021
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.06.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH
published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ege Kimya Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Ayazma Cad. N°37
Papirus Plaza Kat: 10
N°5
10-15 Kagitane
34410 Istanbul / TR
[2016/02]
Inventor(s)01 / CLAUWAERT, Eddy
Sint-Baafsstraat 51
B-8200 Brugge / BE
 [2016/02]
Representative(s)Yalvaç, Oya
Deris Patent ve Marka Acentaligi A.S.
Inebolu Sokak, No: 5
Deris Patent Binasi
Kabatas/Setüstü
34427 Karakoy/Istanbul / TR
[N/P]
Former [2020/30]Yalvaç, Oya
Deris Patent ve Marka Acentaligi A.S.
Inebolu Sokak, No: 5
Deris Patent Binasi
Kabatas/Setüstü
TR-34427 Karakoy/Istanbul / TR
Former [2016/02]Korkut, Nazli Tugba
Deris Patents & Trademarks Agency A.S.
Inebolu sok. Deris Patent Building
No. 5 Setustu-Kabatas
34427 Istanbul / TR
Application number, filing date14722800.106.03.2014
[2016/02]
WO2014TR00058
Priority number, dateTR2013000269806.03.2013         Original published format: TR 201302698
TR2014000132305.02.2014         Original published format: TR 201401323
[2016/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014137307
Date:12.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2964685
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2964685
Date:22.07.2020
Language:EN
[2020/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2014
ClassificationIPC:C08G18/75, C08G18/76, C09D167/08, C09D175/14, C08G18/36, C08L75/14
[2016/02]
CPC:
C08G18/7621 (EP,US); C08G18/36 (US); C08G18/222 (EP,US);
C08G18/4288 (EP,US); C08G18/755 (US); C08L75/06 (US);
C09D167/08 (EP,US); C09D175/14 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/02]
TitleGerman:KOBALT- UND MANGANHALTIGE URETHANISIERTE POLYMERE FÜR LUFTTROCKNENDE BESCHICHTUNGEN AUF POLYMERBASIS, FARBEN UND TINTEN[2016/02]
English:COBALT AND MANGANESE BASED URETHANIZED POLYMERS FOR AIR DRYING POLYMER-BASED COATINGS, PAINTS AND INKS[2016/02]
French:POLYMÈRES URÉTHANISÉS À BASE DE COBALT ET DE MANGANÈSE POUR REVÊTEMENTS, PEINTURES ET ENCRES À BASE DE POLYMÈRE SÉCHANT À L'AIR[2016/02]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2015National basic fee paid 
02.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/02]
25.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2017Fee for grant paid
23.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination21.03.2018Appeal received No.  J0003/18
28.05.2018Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2018/22]
30.07.2018Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/31]
27.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
04.06.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP16199583.2   Application withdrawn  : 21.11.2016
EP16199666.5
EP17177658.6  / EP3255075
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2016
Opposition(s)23.04.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.04.201603   M06   Fee paid on   06.04.2016
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Stay/Interruption14.07.2017Stay of proceedings[2017/35]
14.07.2017Stay of proceedings[2020/21]
08.06.2020Resumption of proceedings[2020/21]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.03.2014
AL22.07.2020
CY22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
MK22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
RS22.07.2020
SE22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
AT06.03.2021
IE06.03.2021
LU06.03.2021
CH31.03.2021
[2024/31]
Former [2024/22]HU06.03.2014
AL22.07.2020
CY22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
MK22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
RS22.07.2020
SE22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
AT06.03.2021
IE06.03.2021
LU06.03.2021
Former [2023/31]HU06.03.2014
AL22.07.2020
CY22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
RS22.07.2020
SE22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
AT06.03.2021
IE06.03.2021
LU06.03.2021
Former [2023/30]HU06.03.2014
AL22.07.2020
CY22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
RS22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
AT06.03.2021
IE06.03.2021
LU06.03.2021
Former [2023/26]HU06.03.2014
AL22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
RS22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
AT06.03.2021
IE06.03.2021
LU06.03.2021
Former [2022/36]AL22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
AT06.03.2021
IE06.03.2021
LU06.03.2021
Former [2022/09]AL22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
IE06.03.2021
LU06.03.2021
Former [2022/07]AL22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
IE06.03.2021
Former [2021/36]AL22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
SI22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
Former [2021/28]AL22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
SK22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
Former [2021/25]AL22.07.2020
CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
Former [2021/23]CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
MC22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
SM22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
Former [2021/22]CZ22.07.2020
DK22.07.2020
EE22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
RO22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
Former [2021/21]DK22.07.2020
FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
Former [2021/10]FI22.07.2020
HR22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
LV22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
Former [2021/08]FI22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
BG22.10.2020
NO22.10.2020
PT23.11.2020
Former [2021/07]FI22.07.2020
LT22.07.2020
NO22.10.2020
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4434694  (LECHNER JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 7,10 *;
 [I]WO2010076031  (UMICORE NV [BE], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 1-7; claim 1 *;
 [XI]WO2011098583  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,8,9,13-15 * claims 1,9; table 2 * [I] 2-7,10-12;
 [ID]WO2012000934  (UMICORE NV [BE], et al) [ID] 1-15* examples 1-2; claim 1 *
by applicantGB550441
 GB1232194
 EP2370534
 WO2012000934
 US2012041133
    - J.H. BIELEMAN, Additives for Coatings, WILEY NCH, (2000), page 202
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.