Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2969726

EP2969726 - BICYCLE REAR SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voss, Darrell, W.
P.O. Box 119
Vancouver, WA 98666 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Dickerson, David
Gartenstrasse 51
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date14723175.713.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US26847
Priority number, dateUS20131384075415.03.2013         Original published format: US201313840754
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014152035
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2969726
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:B62K25/20, B62K25/28
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:HINTERRADAUFHÄNGUNG FÜR FAHRRÄDER[2016/03]
English:BICYCLE REAR SUSPENSION[2016/03]
French:SUSPENSION ARRIÈRE DE BICYCLETTE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2015National basic fee paid 
15.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
07.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [ N /P ]
12.02.2019Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [ N /P ]
20.03.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination30.05.2019Appeal received No.  T2514/19
30.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
07.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO2012024697  (ZAWISTOWSKI PETER [US]) [X] 1-13,15,17-22,24-30 * abstract * [A] 16 [I] 14,23,31;
 [XAI]US6361059  (ELLSWORTH ANTHONY S [US]) [X] 1-13,15,17-20,22,23,29,30 * the whole document * [A] 14,16,21,25 [I] 24,31;
 [X]FR2898578  (CYCLES LAPIERRE SOC PAR ACTION [FR]) [X] 1-13,15,16,18-20,22-25,29,30 * the whole document *;
 [XI]WO9529838  (FARRIS MARK S [US], et al) [X] 1-15,21-26,29,30 * abstract * [I] 31
by applicantUS2006063624