Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2994723

EP2994723 - SCANNING HEAD FOR AN ENCODER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/11]SENSING HEAD
[2017/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baumer Hübner GmbH
Max-Dohrn-Strasse 2+4
10589 Berlin / DE
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / HILLER, Bernhard
Gollanczstrasse 113
13465 Berlin / DE
02 / LOHARENS, Axel
Wisbyerstr. 47
13189 Berlin / DE
03 / PFEFFER, Armin
Ruhlsdorfer Strasse 33e
14513 Teltow / DE
04 / WEISS, Michael
Schwabstedter Weg 6
13503 Berlin / DE
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Strauss, Steffen
Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 Group Intellectual Property
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2016/11]
Application number, filing date14723410.807.05.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014EP59295
Priority number, dateEP2013016689407.05.2013         Original published format: EP 13166894
[2016/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014180879
Date:13.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2994723
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2994723
Date:20.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01D11/24
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABTASTKOPF FÜR EINEN GEBER[2017/23]
English:SCANNING HEAD FOR AN ENCODER[2017/23]
French:TÊTE DE BALAYAGE POUR UN CAPTEUR[2017/23]
Former [2016/11]ABTASTKOPF
Former [2016/11]SENSING HEAD
Former [2016/11]TÊTE DE PALPAGE
Entry into regional phase24.11.2015National basic fee paid 
24.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
20.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2017Fee for grant paid
09.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
GB07.05.2018
IE07.05.2018
LU07.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/21]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
GB07.05.2018
IE07.05.2018
LU07.05.2018
Former [2019/19]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
IE07.05.2018
LU07.05.2018
Former [2019/17]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
LU07.05.2018
Former [2019/06]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/43]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/35]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/24]CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/23]CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102005056207  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0044] *;
 [AP]EP2660567  (LEINE & LINDE AB [SE]) [AP] 1;
 [A]EP0560381  (TDK CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0800087  (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2455721  (BAUMER INNOTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102007022765  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] *