Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2994020

EP2994020 - HAND-HELD CONTROL FOR AN ELECTOMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE, METHOD FOR DETECTING ACTUATION OF A HAND-HELD CONTROL, AND ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/11]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HILLE, Armin
Neuer Brink 10
33659 Bielefeld / DE
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/11]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14723438.912.05.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014EP59665
Priority number, dateDE20131010482710.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013104827
[2016/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014180998
Date:13.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2994020
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04, A47C31/00, H03K17/96
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
TitleGerman:HANDBEDIENUNG FÜR EINEN ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN MÖBELANTRIEB, VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN EINER BETÄTIGUNG EINER HANDBEDIENUNG, UND EIN ELEKTROMOTORISCHER MÖBELANTRIEB[2016/11]
English:HAND-HELD CONTROL FOR AN ELECTOMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE, METHOD FOR DETECTING ACTUATION OF A HAND-HELD CONTROL, AND ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE[2016/11]
French:COMMANDE MANUELLE POUR UN MÉCANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT DE MEUBLE À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN ACTIONNEMENT D'UNE COMMANDE MANUELLE ET MÉCANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT DE MEUBLE[2016/11]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2015National basic fee paid 
10.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
12.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2012118718  (GEIGER PETER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-11,13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]WO2012061406  (RAWLS-MEEHAN MARTIN B [US]) [X] 1-6,13 * paragraph [0329] - paragraph [0332]; figures 6-21 *;
 [X]US2003195644  (BORDERS RICHARD L [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0067]; figures 9-26 *;
 [X]US2010292945  (REYNOLDS JOSEPH KURTH [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-15,17,18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0025] - paragraph [0207]; figures 1-23 *;
 [X]US2011156930  (CHEN LIN-CHIEN [TW] ET AL) [X] 1,3-15,17,18 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-14 *