blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3019890

EP3019890 - ASSEMBLY FOR A DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.04.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2020/18]
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUMANN, Michael
Leinfeldenerstrasse 60A
70597 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/20]
Application number, filing date14723444.713.05.2014
[2016/20]
WO2014EP59719
Priority number, dateDE20131021347510.07.2013         Original published format: DE102013213475
[2016/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015003835
Date:15.01.2015
Language:DE
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3019890
Date:18.05.2016
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3019890
Date:16.09.2020
Language:DE
[2020/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.2015
ClassificationIPC:G01S15/931, G01S7/521, G01S15/87
[2020/19]
CPC:
G01S7/521 (EP); G01S15/87 (EP); G01S15/931 (EP)
Former IPC [2016/20]G01S15/87, G01S15/89, G01S15/93, G01S7/521
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BAUGRUPPE FÜR EIN FAHRASSISTENZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES FAHRASSISTENZSYSTEMS[2016/20]
English:ASSEMBLY FOR A DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM[2016/20]
French:MODULE DESTINÉ À UN SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE[2016/20]
Entry into regional phase10.02.2016National basic fee paid 
10.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
21.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
18.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2020Fee for grant paid
04.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)17.06.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
02.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.05.2014
AL16.09.2020
CY16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
MK16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
AT13.05.2021
IE13.05.2021
LU13.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU13.05.2014
AL16.09.2020
CY16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
AT13.05.2021
IE13.05.2021
LU13.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2023/29]HU13.05.2014
AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
AT13.05.2021
IE13.05.2021
LU13.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/37]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
AT13.05.2021
IE13.05.2021
LU13.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/34]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
IE13.05.2021
LU13.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/21]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
IE13.05.2021
LU13.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/11]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
LU13.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/09]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
LU13.05.2021
Former [2022/07]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/37]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/36]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/28]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/25]AL16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
ES16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/23]CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/21]FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/20]FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
Former [2021/18]FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
NL16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
Former [2021/09]FI16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI16.09.2020
SE16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI16.09.2020
NO16.12.2020
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE102011052377  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-10 * paragraph [0020]; figure 2 * [Y] 2;
 [XAY]DE102011011122  (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-2 * [A] 1,3-8[Y] 2
ExaminationDE102005056800
by applicantDE102005040997
 DE102011006068
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.