Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2992349

EP2992349 - DETACHABLE RECEIVER BLOCK COMPRISING A DIGITIZER FOR A FAMILY OF LOCAL RF COILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.02.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2016/10]
Inventor(s)01 / DUENSING, George Randall
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / FRIMAN, Olli T.
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / SPENCER, Christopher
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / HUMPHREYS, Drew Warren
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2016/10]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date14723483.522.04.2014
[2016/10]
WO2014IB60883
Priority number, dateUS201361818473P02.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361818473 P
[2016/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014177971
Date:06.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2992349
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/34, G01R33/36
[2016/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
TitleGerman:ABNEHMBARER EMPFÄNGERBLOCK MIT EINEM DIGITALISIERER FÜR EINE SERIE AUS LOKALEN HF-SPULEN[2016/10]
English:DETACHABLE RECEIVER BLOCK COMPRISING A DIGITIZER FOR A FAMILY OF LOCAL RF COILS[2016/10]
French:BLOC DE RÉCEPTEUR DÉTACHABLE COMPRENANT UN NUMÉRISEUR POUR UN ENSEMBLE DE BOBINES RF LOCALES[2016/10]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2015National basic fee paid 
02.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/10]
10.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5491415  (HOLMES TIMOTHY B [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11,12,18,21 * column 4, line 66 - column 7, line 67 * * figures 2-5 * [I] 3-5,7,10,13-17,19,20;
 [XI]US2009149737  (HANSEN JOHN W [CA] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11,12,17,18,21 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 3, 4 * [I] 3,7,10,13-16,19,20;
 [Y]US2009030305  (HOOGEVEEN ROMHILD [NL]) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 2-4 *;
 [Y]WO2004089211  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; TUITHOF HANS H [NL]; DEN BOEF JOH) [Y] 1-21 * page 3, line 6 - page 13, line 9 *;
 [A]US2009251141  (BAUMGARTL RUDI [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *