Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2968016

EP2968016 - NEGATIVE PRESSURE WOUND CLOSURE DEVICE AND SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF USE IN TREATING WOUNDS WITH NEGATIVE PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smith&Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
For all designated states
The University of Massachusetts
225 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Boston, MA 02210 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / DUNN, Raymond, M.
10 Spring Street
Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US
02 / HARTWELL, Edward, Yerbury
c/o Smith&Nephew Research Centre
York Science Park
Heslington Yorkshire YO10 5DF / GB
03 / HICKS, John, Kenneth
c/o Smith&Nephew Research Centre
York Science Park
Heslington Yorkshire YO10 5DF / GB
04 / HUDDLESTON, Elizabeth, Mary
c/o Smith&Nephew Research Centre
York Science Park
Heslington Yorkshire YO10 5DF / GB
05 / SAXBY, Carl
c/o Smith&Nephew Research Centre
York Science Park
Heslington Yorkshire YO10 5DF / GB
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date14723917.212.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US25059
Priority number, dateUS201361780660P13.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361780660 P
US201361891857P16.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361891857 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014165275
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2968016
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2968016
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61F13/02
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNTERDRUCK-WUNDVERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON WUNDEN[2018/02]
English:NEGATIVE PRESSURE WOUND CLOSURE DEVICE AND SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF USE IN TREATING WOUNDS WITH NEGATIVE PRESSURE[2016/03]
French:DISPOSITIF A DEPRESSION DE FERMETURE DES PLAIES ET SYSTEMES ET METHODES D'UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES PLAIES[2018/02]
Former [2016/03]UNTERDRUCK-WUNDVERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON WUNDEN MITTELS UNTERDRUCK
Former [2016/03]DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE DE PLAIE PAR PRESSION NÉGATIVE ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION LORS DU TRAITEMENT DES PLAIES PAR PRESSION NÉGATIVE
Entry into regional phase21.08.2015National basic fee paid 
21.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
23.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2018Fee for grant paid
25.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18169232.8  / EP3372209
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.12.2016
Opposition(s)12.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
LU12.03.2019
[2020/01]
Former [2019/46]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/37]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
NO11.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL11.07.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004162512  (LIEDTKE WAYNE L [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0019] - [0030]; figures 1,2 *;
 [I]WO2011106722  (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [I] 5-12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021]; figure 1, *;
 [A]WO2004018020  (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 30 *;
 [A]US2007118096  (SMITH JOSHUA D [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0039] , [0058] - [0064] *;
 [A]WO2010075180  (KCI LICENSSING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 27] - [0029] - [0 31] *
by applicantUS2009306609
 US7753894
 US2011213287
 US2011282309
 US2012209227
 US7524315
 US2011054365
 WO2013US50698