Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2968124

EP2968124 - TRANSDERMAL FORMULATIONS OF FLUTICASONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.03.2018  [2018/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Strategic Science & Technologies, LLC
58 Charles Street
Cambridge MA 02141 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / COREY, Elias James
20 Avon Hill Street
Cambridge, MA 02140 / US
02 / FOSSEL, Eric, T.
2 Bond Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Gill, Siân Victoria , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Heare, Tanya
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14724202.814.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US27157
Priority number, dateUS201361790770P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361790770 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014152280
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2968124
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K47/02, A61K9/06, A61K9/70, A61K31/00
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:TRANSDERMALE FORMULIERUNGEN VON FLUTICASON[2016/03]
English:TRANSDERMAL FORMULATIONS OF FLUTICASONE[2016/03]
French:FORMULATIONS TRANSDERMIQUES DE FLUTICASONE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2015National basic fee paid 
29.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
30.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/11]
30.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010129819  (LAB SKIN CARE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,18,19,22-27,29-36,43-45,49,50,52-57,89-97 * page 4 - page 6 * * page 21 * * pages 23-25 * * page 33, lines 6-24 * * page 32, lines 23-24 * * page 35, lines 19-20, 23-24, 31 * * page 36, line 31 * * page 37, lines 1-15 * * page 40, lines 4-21 * * page 46, line 26 * * page 49, line 23 - page 50, line 4 *;
 [XI]WO2010132605  (PROTEIN DELIVERY SOLUTIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,14,15,18,22-27,29,35-38,52-54,56,57,89-97 * page 4, lines 20-24 * * page 7, lines 15, 22-24, 33 * * page 12, lines 1-11 * * page 13, line 3 * * page 17, lines 6-33 * * page 18, lines 5-8 * * page 27, line 11 * * page 31, lines 21-22 * * page 32, line 33 * * page 33, lines 13-15 * * page 34, line 31 * * page 49; claim 20 * [I] 7-13,16,17,20,21,28,39-42,46-48,51,55,58-88,98;
 [A]  - SANTUS G C ET AL, "Transdermal enhancer patent literature", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 25, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0168-3659(93)90090-R, ISSN 0168-3659, (19930527), pages 1 - 20, (19930527), XP025526719 [A] 7-13,28,40-42,58-80 * page 7; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(93)90090-R
by applicantWO2005081964
 WO2005102282
 WO9913717
 US2008280984
 US2009105336
 WO2005102307
 US2002041903
 US2003028169
 US2003018076
 US5895658
 US5922332
 US6207713
 US6458841