Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2994254

EP2994254 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ROLLING THREADS WITH ROLLING ROLLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Streicher, Josef
Berger Halde 10
88079 Kressbronn / DE
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / STREICHER, Josef
Berger Halde 10
88079 Kressbronn / DE
02 / SCHWEDA, Libor
Linsellestrasse 167
47877 Willich Schiefbahn / DE
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2016/11]
Application number, filing date14724302.626.04.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014EP01117
Priority number, dateDE2013100790608.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013007906
[2016/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014180540
Date:13.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2994254
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2994254
Date:24.07.2019
Language:DE
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B21H3/04, B21H9/02
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GEWINDEWALZEN MIT WALZROLLEN[2016/11]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ROLLING THREADS WITH ROLLING ROLLS[2016/11]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE LAMINAGE DES FILETS AU MOYEN DE ROULEAUX DE LAMINAGE[2016/11]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2015National basic fee paid 
02.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
05.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2019Fee for grant paid
26.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE1013613  (PEE WEE MASCHINEN UND APPBAU I) [X] 1-4,7 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-5 * [I] 5,6,8,9;
 [XI]DE939628  (PEE WEE MASCHINEN UND APPBAU I) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 2, line 98 - page 4, line 12; figures 1,2 * [I] 4-6,9;
 [XI]BE495407  (MAPRE, MACHINES & APPAREILS DE PRECISION, S.A.) [X] 1-3,7 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 24; figure 2 * [I] 4-6,8,9;
 [X]DE1158346  (PEE WEE MASCHINEN UND APPBAU W) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 48; figures 1,2 *