Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2984775

EP2984775 - LOW COMPLEXITY BLIND DETECTION OF TRANSMISSION PARAMETERS OF INTERFERERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.06.2017  [2017/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/40]
Former [2016/07]For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LUO, Tao
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / CHENDAMARAI KANNAN, Arumugam
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / MALLIK, Siddhartha
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / JOHN WILSON, Makesh Pravin
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / YOO, Taesang
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / HUANG, Yi
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/07]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/07]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14724911.407.04.2014
[2016/07]
WO2014US33220
Priority number, dateUS201361809828P08.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361809828 P
US20141424602204.04.2014         Original published format: US201414246022
[2016/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014168886
Date:16.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2984775
Date:17.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014
[2016/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00
[2016/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
TitleGerman:BLINDDETEKTION MIT NIEDRIGER KOMPLEXITÄT VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSPARAMETERN VON STÖRERN[2016/07]
English:LOW COMPLEXITY BLIND DETECTION OF TRANSMISSION PARAMETERS OF INTERFERERS[2016/07]
French:DÉTECTION EN AVEUGLE DE FAIBLE COMPLEXITÉ DE PARAMÈTRES DE TRANSMISSION DE BROUILLEURS[2016/07]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2015National basic fee paid 
03.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/07]
08.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/26]
14.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2010141911  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; GOROKHOV ALEXEI Y [US]; AGRAWAL AVNEESH [US]) [X] 1,12,23,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0029] - [0035] - [0049] , [0057] , [0062] , [0075] , [0083] - [0086]; claims 1-9 * [I] 2-11,13-22,24-29;
 [XI]US2012172041  (KRISHNAMURTHY SANDEEP H [US] ET AL) [X] 1,12,23,30 * paragraphs [0037] - [0047] - [0061] - [0062] - [0082]; claims 1-3 * [I] 2-11,13-22,24-29