Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2989779

EP2989779 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES TO CONVEY A LOCAL CALL HOLD STATE TO A RECIPIENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.12.2018  [2018/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/09]
Inventor(s)01 / SINHA, Abhijeet
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / SACHDEVA, Nitin
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / GOEL, Neha
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/09]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14725330.616.04.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014US34400
Priority number, dateUS20131386711721.04.2013         Original published format: US201313867117
[2016/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014176100
Date:30.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2989779
Date:02.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2016/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04M3/428, H04W4/16
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR WEITERLEITUNG EINES ORTSGESPRÄCH-HALTESTATUS AN EINE EMPFÄNGERVORRICHTUNG[2016/09]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUSES TO CONVEY A LOCAL CALL HOLD STATE TO A RECIPIENT DEVICE[2016/09]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR TRANSMETTRE UN ÉTAT DE MISE EN ATTENTE LOCALE À UN DISPOSITIF DESTINATAIRE[2016/09]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2015National basic fee paid 
18.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
07.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/51]
31.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]CN1604661  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,13,16,17,19,21,22,24,26-43 * abstract * * page 4, line 7 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 3 - page 5, line 25 * * page 6, line 19 - page 9, line 9 * * figures 2,3 * [I] 3,5-9,12,14,15,18,20,23,25;
 [I]WO2010127585  (ZTE CORP [CN]; CONG WEN [CN]; ZHU PENGBO [CN]; ZHANG QINGZHI [CN]) [I] 1-43 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 5, line 13 * * page 2; figures 2-6 *