Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2994924

EP2994924 - INDUCTOR TUNABLE BY A VARIABLE MAGNETIC FLUX DENSITY COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Daeik D.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LEE, Kangho
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / BERDY, David F.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / VELEZ, Mario Francisco
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / KIM, Jonghae
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / LAN, Je-Hsiung
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
07 / YUN, Changhan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
08 / MUDAKATTE, Niranjan Sunil
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
09 / MIKULKA, Robert P.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/11]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14725342.122.04.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014US35038
Priority number, dateUS20131388763306.05.2013         Original published format: US201313887633
[2016/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014182444
Date:13.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2994924
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01F21/06, H01F21/08, H01F27/255
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
TitleGerman:INDUKTOR, ABSTIMMBAR MITTELS EINES BAUTEILS VERÄNDERLICHER MAGNETISCHER FLUSSDICHTE[2019/12]
English:INDUCTOR TUNABLE BY A VARIABLE MAGNETIC FLUX DENSITY COMPONENT[2016/11]
French:INDUCTANCE RÉGLABLE PAR UN COMPOSANT DE INDUCTION MAGNÉTIQUE VARIABLE[2019/12]
Former [2016/11]ÜBER EINE KOMPONENTE MIT VARIABLER MAGNETISCHER FLUSSDICHTE EINSTELLBARER INDUKTOR
Former [2016/11]INDUCTEUR ACCORDABLE PAR UN COMPOSANT DE DENSITÉ DE FLUX MAGNÉTIQUE VARIABLE
Entry into regional phase23.09.2015National basic fee paid 
23.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
12.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]SU1737526  (KHAJRYUZOV VIKTOR V [SU]; KHAJRYUZOVA LYUDMILA A [SU]) [X] 1,21,51,55 * abstract *;
 [X]KR101223607B  (KYUNGPOOK NAT UNIV IND ACAD [KR]) [X] 1,21,51,55 * figures 1,5 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0044] *;
 [A]EP1069576  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,21,51,55 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0026] *;
 [A]GB783549  (NEOSID LTD) [A] 1,21,51,55 * page 1; figures 2,3,6 *;
 [A]JPH0696957  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [A] 1,21,51,55 * abstract *;
 [X]US2010220516  (LEE KANGHO [US] ET AL) [X] 10-20,34-36,38-50,53,54,58-60,63,64,68-70 * figures 1,2,9,10 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0030] - [0075] - [0091] *;
 [AP]WO2013166479  (QUALCOMM INC) [AP] 10,34,53,58,63,68 * figures 1-4,7,8 * * paragraphs [0088] - [0098] - [0019] - [0068] *;
 [XI]US2003127317  (COPE DAVID B [US] ET AL) [X] 10,17-19,34-37,48,53,54,58 * abstract * [I] 68-70;
 [XI]US2012086394  (HUI SHU YUEN RON [HK]) [X] 10-12,17-19,34-36,41,43,46,48,53,58 * abstract * [I] 68-70
 [XI]  - BABAK ASSADSANGABI ET AL, "Planar Variable Inductor Controlled by Ferrofluid Actuation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20130401), vol. 49, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TMAG.2012.2228212, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 1402 - 1406, XP011497412 [X] 1,5-9,21-23,26,27,29-33,51,52,55-57 * page 1402 - page 1403; figures 1-4 * [I] 24,28,61,62,65-67

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMAG.2012.2228212
 [XI]  - ASSADSANGABI B ET AL, "Ferrofluid-based variable inductor", MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS), 2012 IEEE 25TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120129), doi:10.1109/MEMSYS.2012.6170359, ISBN 978-1-4673-0324-8, pages 1121 - 1124, XP032137420 [X] 1,5-9,21-23,26,27,29-33,51,52,55-57 * page 1121 - page 1122; figures 1-5 * [I] 24,28,61,62,65-67

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.2012.6170359
 [A]  - LU Y ET AL, "Modifying the Surface Properties of Superparamagnetic Iron Oxide Nanoparticles through A Sol-Gel Approach", NANO LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20020111), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1021/NL015681Q, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 183 - 186, XP002989087 [A] 28 * pages 183-184 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl015681q
 [A]  - CHEN H J ET AL, "Preparation and characterization of silicon oil based ferrofluid", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 257, no. 24, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2011.07.103, ISSN 0169-4332, (20110723), pages 10802 - 10807, (20110729), XP028291489 [A] 28 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2011.07.103