Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3001857

EP3001857 - LIGHTING DEVICE AND MOUNTING METHOD FOR A LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seidel GmbH & Co. KG
Rosenstraße 8
35037 Marburg / DE
[2016/14]
Inventor(s)01 / RITZENHOFF, Andreas
Wilhelm-Busch-Strasse 56
35037 Marburg / DE
02 / ENGEL, Lutz
Untern Rotscheid 3
57234 Wilnsdorf / DE
03 / RACHE, Jörg
Auf dem Wulf 12
35041 Marburg-Michelbach / DE
04 / ARNOLD, Oliver
Auf den Höfen 1
35232 Dautphetal-Allendorf / DE
 [2016/14]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/44]
Former [2016/14]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14726105.113.05.2014
[2016/14]
WO2014EP59800
Priority number, dateDE20131010501115.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013105011
DE20141010140305.02.2014         Original published format: DE102014101403
[2016/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014184214
Date:20.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3001857
Date:06.04.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014
[2016/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3001857
Date:01.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:F21K9/90, F21V3/04, F21V17/16, F21V19/00, F21V17/00, F21V15/01, F21V29/71, F21K9/232, F21K9/60, // F21V7/00, F21V23/00, F21Y115/10, F21Y107/00, F21K9/238
[2017/22]
Former International [2016/14]F21V17/00, F21K99/00, F21V23/00, F21V29/00, F21Y101/00, F21V3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEUCHTVORRICHTUNG UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN FÜR EINE LEUCHTVORRICHTUNG[2016/14]
English:LIGHTING DEVICE AND MOUNTING METHOD FOR A LIGHTING DEVICE[2016/14]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE DU DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2016/14]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2015National basic fee paid 
11.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/14]
14.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2017Fee for grant paid
19.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
IE13.05.2018
LU13.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
IE13.05.2018
LU13.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
LU13.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/43]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/23]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE102012100838  (COOLER MASTER CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 8,10,11 * [Y] 3-5;
 [YA]WO2012020366  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 3-5 * page 3, paragraph 9 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * [A] 1;
 [X]US2009218923  (GINGRICH III CHARLES RAYMOND [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2012049599  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * page 5, line 1 - line 23 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP2532942  (EVERLIGHT ELECTRONICS CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * figure 1b *