Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3001857 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3001857



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 291
05.09.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.11.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.10.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.09.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.09.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.09.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
19.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
29.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 31
04.04.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
14.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.07.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 15
14.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
14.07.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
14.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.01.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.12.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
25.09.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.12.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
08.12.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
20.11.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.11.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.11.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33
17.09.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
17.09.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
17.09.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
17.09.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
03.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
13.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
13.05.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
13.05.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
13.05.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 17
13.05.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 12