Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3001857


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
04.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.02.2019  [2019/06]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
07.09.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
29.09.2017 (Expected) grant published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.09.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.04.2017 Change - classification published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
28.04.2017 Change - classification published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
22.07.2016 Change - extension states published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
18.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
16.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.03.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
04.03.2016 Request for examination filed published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
02.03.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
05.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2015 Change - representative
12.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
29.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication