Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2995107

EP2995107 - METHOD FOR SCHEDULING RADIO RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2017New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri, 1
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / CARETTI, Marco
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
02 / NARDINI, Giovanni
Università di Pisa - Dipartimento di Ingegneria
dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
03 / SABELLA, Dario
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
04 / STEA, Giovanni
Università di Pisa - Dipartimento di Ingegneria
dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
05 / VIRDIS, Antonio
Università di Pisa - Dipartimento di Ingegneria
dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Maccalli, Marco , et al
Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l.
Via Settembrini, 40
20124 Milano / IT
[2016/11]
Application number, filing date14726549.008.05.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014EP59419
Priority number, dateIT2013MI0075609.05.2013         Original published format: IT MI20130756
[2016/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014180940
Date:13.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2995107
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/10, H04W72/08
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR TERMINIERUNG VON FUNKRESSOURCEN[2016/11]
English:METHOD FOR SCHEDULING RADIO RESOURCES[2016/11]
French:PROCEDE DE PLANIFICATION DE RESSOURCES RADIO[2016/11]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2015National basic fee paid 
24.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
16.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010025953  (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE], et al) [X] 1,11 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 20 * * page 4, lines 5-33 * * page 8, lines 26-30 * * page 11, lines 15-17 * * page 12, lines 1-8, 19-20 * * page 12, line 27 - page 13, line 30 * * page 16, line 24 - page 17, line 19 * * figures 1, 2A, 3A, 4, 5 * [Y] 2,3,6,7,10 [I] 4,5,8,9;
 [Y]EP1549093  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 2,3,6,7 * paragraph [0045] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0063] * * paragraphs [0067] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0080] * * paragraphs [0115] - [0116] * * paragraph [0131] * * figures 2-5, 8 *;
 [Y]US2010317364  (ZHANG HANG [CA], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0098] - [0101] * * figure 9 *
by applicant   - MAHMUDUR RAHMAN; HALIM YANIKOMEROGLU, "Enhancing Cell-Edge Performance: A Downlink Dynamic Interference Avoidance Scheme with Inter-Cell Coordination", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, (201004), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 1414 - 1425,