Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2995034

EP2995034 - ENHANCED PDSCH OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Wanshi
QUALCOMM Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / DAMNJANOVIC, Aleksandar
QUALCOMM Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / GAAL, Peter
QUALCOMM Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
04 / XU, Hao
QUALCOMM Incorporated
Attn: InternationaL IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2018/38]
Former [2016/11]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14726851.025.04.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014US35458
Priority number, dateUS201361821138P08.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361821138 P
US20141422158821.03.2014         Original published format: US201414221588
[2016/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014182470
Date:13.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2995034
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2995034
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTER PDSCH-BETRIEB[2016/11]
English:ENHANCED PDSCH OPERATION[2016/11]
French:OPÉRATION AMÉLIORÉE DE PDSCH[2016/11]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2015National basic fee paid 
05.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
07.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2018Fee for grant paid
06.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Details of multiplexing of DCI messages", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-121023, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120320), vol. RAN WG1, no. Jeju, Republic of Korea; 20120326 - 20120330, XP050599331 [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14,16-20,22-24,26-30 * page 1 - page 3 * [I] 5,9,15,21,25
 [A]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Analysis on control signaling enhancements", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chicago, USA; 20130415 - 20130419, (20130406), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-130892, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72b/Docs/, (20130406), XP050696894 [A] 1-30 * page 1 - page 3 *
 [A]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Remaining details for the PDSCH starting symbol in TM10", vol. RAN WG1, no. New Orleans, USA; 20121112 - 20121116, (20121103), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-124696, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_71/Docs/, (20121103), XP050662740 [A] 1-30 * page 1 - page 3 *
 [XP]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Control Channel Overhead Reduction", vol. RAN WG1, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20130520 - 20130524, (20130511), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-132491 CONTROL CHANNEL OVERHEAD REDUCTION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_73/Docs/, (20130511), XP050698209 [XP] 1-30 * the whole document *