Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2992008

EP2992008 - THERAPEUTIC PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 10.04.2019 [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2016/10]
Inventor(s)01 / DOCK, Steven Thomas
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents
Five Moore Drive
Research Triangle Park
North Carolina 27709 / US
02 / CARPENTER, Andrew James
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents
Five Moore Drive
Research Triangle Park
North Carolina 27709 / US
03 / HUNTER, III, Robert Neil
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents
Five Moore Drive
Research Triangle Park
North Carolina 27709 / US
04 / WU, Yulin
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents
Five Moore Drive
Research Triangle Park
North Carolina 27709 / US
05 / SRIVASTAVA, Ved P.
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents
Five Moore Drive
Research Triangle Park
North Carolina 27709 / US
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Wilson, Lynn Margaret , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2016/10]
Application number, filing date14727241.330.04.2014
[2016/10]
WO2014IB61123
Priority number, dateUS201361818624P02.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361818624 P
[2016/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014178018
Date:06.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2992008
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014
[2016/10]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2992008
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/575, A61K38/00, A61K38/22
[2016/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Extension statesBA23.10.2015
ME23.10.2015
TitleGerman:THERAPEUTISCHE PEPTIDE[2016/10]
English:THERAPEUTIC PEPTIDES[2016/10]
French:PEPTIDES THÉRAPEUTIQUES[2016/10]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2015National basic fee paid 
23.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/10]
02.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2019Fee for grant paid
22.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.04.2018Request for further processing filed
05.04.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.04.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2006066024  (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0026] , [0028] , [0031] , [0216] , [0240] , [0243] - [0255] - [0269]; table 4 *;
 [I]WO2005077094  (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * page 26, line 7 - line 9 * * page 47, line 13 - line 23 * * page 66, line 28 - line 32 * * page 70, line 22 - line 25 *;
 [I]WO2012006566  (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * claims 64-68,85-89 *;
 [I]WO2012101413  (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-19 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2011050008  (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *
by applicantUS5424286
 WO9925728
 WO9925727
 WO9805351
 WO9940788
 WO9907404
 WO9943708
 WO9011299
 WO9111457
 US2013029938
 US5612051
 US5714159
 US6413539
 US6004573
 US6117949
 US4675189
 US6669961
    - FLEGAL ET AL., JAMA, (2012), vol. 307, no. 5, pages 491 - 7
    - SCHWARTZ ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, no. 6898, pages 595 - 7
    - LE ROUX, ANN SURG., (2006), vol. 243, no. 1, pages 108 - 14
    - BATTERHAM ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2003), vol. 349, no. 10, pages 941 - 8
    - SLOTH ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL ENDOCRINOL METAB., (2007), vol. 293, no. 2, pages E604 - 9
    - GANTZ ET AL., J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2007), vol. 92, no. 5, pages 1754 - 7
    - GUTNIAK, M. ET AL., N. ENGL. J. BLED., (1992), vol. 326, pages 1316 - 22
    - AMIN ET AL., J OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2001), vol. 73, pages 49 - 57
    - "Recombinant Protein Production in Yeast Methods and Protocols", ROSALYN M. BILL,, Methood in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2012), vol. 866
    - JAYAWICKREME ET AL., CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN PHARMACOLOGY, (2005), pages 12.9.1 - 12